Answer :

(i) 25

Here, a = 2, b = 5



252 = 625


And,


252 = 25× 25 = 625


(ii) 37


Here, a = 3, b = 7



372 = 1369


And,


372 = 37× 37 = 1369


(iii) 54


Here, a = 5, b = 4



542 = 2916


And,


542 = 54× 54 = 2916


(iv) 71


Here, a = 7, b = 1



712 = 4941


And,


712 = 71× 71 = 4941


(v) 96


Here, a = 9, b = 6



962 = 9216


And,


962 = 96× 96 = 9216


Rate this question :

How useful is this solution?
We strive to provide quality solutions. Please rate us to serve you better.
Try our Mini CourseMaster Important Topics in 7 DaysLearn from IITians, NITians, Doctors & Academic Experts
Dedicated counsellor for each student
24X7 Doubt Resolution
Daily Report Card
Detailed Performance Evaluation
caricature
view all courses
RELATED QUESTIONS :

Evaluate:

RS Aggarwal - Mathematics

Which of the follRS Aggarwal - Mathematics

Evaluate:

RS Aggarwal - Mathematics

Evaluate:

RS Aggarwal - Mathematics

Find the greatestRS Aggarwal - Mathematics