# Evaluate these using identity:(i) 55 × 45 (ii) 33 × 27(iii) 8.5 × 9.5 (iv) 102 × 98

(i) 55 × 45

We can split 55 as (50+5)

And 45 as (50–5)

Now 55 × 45

= (50+5) (50–5)

Using the identity (a +b) (a–b) = a2 – b2

Here a = 50 and b = 5

= 502 – 52

= 2500 –25

= 2475

(ii) 33 × 27

= (30+3) (30–3)

Using the identity (a +b) (a–b) = a2 – b2

Here a = 30 and b = 3

= (30)2 – 32

= 900 – 9

= 891

(iii) 8.5 × 9.5

= (9 – 0.5) (9 + 0.5)

Using the identity (a +b) (a–b) = a2 – b2

Here a = 9 and b = 0.5

= 92 – (0.5)2

= 81 – 0.25

= 80.75

(iv) 102 × 98

= (100 + 2) (100 – 2)

Using the identity (a +b) (a–b) = a2 – b2

Here a = 100 and b = 2

= (100)2 – 22

= 10000 – 4

= 9996

Rate this question :

How useful is this solution?
We strive to provide quality solutions. Please rate us to serve you better.
Related Videos  Master Algebraic Identities43 mins  Operations on Algebraic Expressions51 mins  Division of Algebraic ExpressionsFREE Class  Division of Algebraic Expressions36 mins  How to Use Algebraic Identities40 mins  Genius Quiz | Algebraic Expressions and Identities30 mins  Foundation | Cracking Previous Year IMO Qs on Algebraic Expressions43 mins  Algebric Expressions and Identities45 mins  Multiplication of Algebraic Expression40 mins  Champ Quiz | Division of Polynomials33 mins
Try our Mini CourseMaster Important Topics in 7 DaysLearn from IITians, NITians, Doctors & Academic Experts
Dedicated counsellor for each student
24X7 Doubt Resolution
Daily Report Card
Detailed Performance Evaluation view all courses 