Q. 1245.0( 1 Vote )

2395 × _____ = 6195 × 2395

Answer :

We know that if a and b are two whole numbers then by commutative property,

a × b= b × a


So, 2395 × 6195 = 6195 × 2395


Rate this question :

How useful is this solution?
We strive to provide quality solutions. Please rate us to serve you better.
RELATED QUESTIONS :

The successor of 1 million is

NCERT - Exemplar Mathematics

The predecessor of 1 lakh is

NCERT - Exemplar Mathematics

24 × 35 = 24 × 18 + 24 × _____

NCERT - Exemplar Mathematics

9128 × _____ = 9128

NCERT - Exemplar Mathematics

8925 × 1 = _____

NCERT - Exemplar Mathematics

2916 × _____ = 0

NCERT - Exemplar Mathematics